Chavoshi, Samieh (CPSO#: 62585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 4135
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samieh Chavoshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chavoshi ( CPSO# 62585 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIEH CHAVOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAVOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1991