Chawla, Satish Kumar (CPSO#: 61961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53357
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satish Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chawla ( CPSO# 61961 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATISH KUMAR CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1990