Cheang, Timothy Sheau-En (CPSO#: 77915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 407
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-9240
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Cheang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheang ( CPSO# 77915 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
401 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY SHEAU-EN CHEANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008