Cheema, Kiran Julia (CPSO#: 88243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
1300 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G8
Phone: (905) 232-6333
Fax: (905) 232-6341
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Unit 3
Brampton ON  L6Y0N2
Canada
Phone: 905-450-7427
Fax: 905-450-2535
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Julia Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cheema ( CPSO# 88243 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
1300 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G8
Phone Number: (905) 232-6333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN JULIA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)