Chelvanathan, Anushya (CPSO#: 87170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Bristol, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health Systems
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: 9056832320 Ext. 4221
Fax: 9054285335
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road, Suite 306
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: (416) 282-4141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 205
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 427-1419
Fax: (905) 427-0346
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anushya Chelvanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chelvanathan ( CPSO# 87170 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health Systems
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
205 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 427-1419

Business Address:
Suite 306
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUSHYA CHELVANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHELVANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011