Chen, Edmund Chi Fai (CPSO#: 84876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 532-2894
Fax: (416) 532-2895
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edmund Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chen ( CPSO# 84876 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 532-2894

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMUND CHI FAI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009