Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chen, Howard Chun-Hao (CPSO#: 69804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care the Beach
Suite 106
1971 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone: (416) 691-6661
Fax: (416) 691-6665
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Athlete's Care King and Yonge
11 King Street West, Suite C-120
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 479-7369
Fax: (416) 368-9992
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Athlete's Care Yonge and Eglinton
2401 Yonge St, Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 479-8369
Fax: (416) 544-9063
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard C.H. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chen ( CPSO# 69804 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care King and Yonge
Suite C-120
11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 691-6661

Business Address:
Athlete's Care the Beach
Suite 106
1971 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone Number: (416) 691-6661

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 544-9065

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD CHUN-HAO CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1996