Chen, Steven Xuanming (CPSO#: 106962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
21 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone: 6137750234
Fax: 3432690900
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen ( CPSO# 106962)

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
Suite 600
21 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 775-0234

Business Address:
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN XUANMING CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017