Cheng, Deborah Wen-Hsin (CPSO#: 82214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 106 A
Rexdale ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: 416 745 4550
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cheng ( CPSO# 82214 )

Business Address:
106A - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Rexdale ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 745-4550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH WEN-HSIN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008