Cheng, Michael Jui-Chia (CPSO#: 60735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Taiwanese

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J3
Phone: (519) 633-4034
Fax: (519) 633-3412
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5V1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cheng ( CPSO# 60735 )

Business Address:
202 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J3
Phone Number: (519) 633-4034

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JUI-CHIA CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990