Cheng, Vincent Chi Kam (CPSO#: 25864)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Chi Kam Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009