Chenoweth, Douglas Rodger (CPSO#: 21377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4514
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kawartha Cardiology Clinic
327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H6
Canada
Phone: (705) 740-6888
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Chenoweth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chenoweth ( CPSO# 21377 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4514

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS RODGER CHENOWETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENOWETH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968