Cheok, Andy San (CPSO#: 68014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TDH - Mental Health Dept.
700 Ross Ave. East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6315
Fax: (705) 264-6525
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
330 2nd Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-8100
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4600
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Cheok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheok ( CPSO# 68014 )

Business Address:
TDH - Mental Health Department
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6315

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
201 - 330 2nd Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8A4
Phone Number: (705) 267-8100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDY SAN CHEOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999