Cherry, James Michael (CPSO#: 56234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-8828
Fax: (416) 438-2793
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James M. Cherry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cherry ( CPSO# 56234 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-8828

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Rouge Valley - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL CHERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987