Chess, David Gordon (CPSO#: 32948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David G. Chess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chess ( CPSO# 32948 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON CHESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988