Chestnut, Heidi Anne (CPSO#: 76227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 231-2520
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heidi Chestnut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chestnut ( CPSO# 76227 )

Business Address:
500 - 267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 760-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDI ANNE CHESTNUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESTNUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003