Cheung, Angela Catherine (CPSO#: 86948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mayo Clinic
Guggenheim Building
17Th Floor
Rochester MN  55901
United States
Phone: 5073228192
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela C. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung ( CPSO# 86948 )

Business Address:
Mayo Clinic
Guggenheim Building
17th Floor
Rochester MN  559 1
Phone Number: (507) 322-8192

Business Address:
Toronto Centre for Liver Disease
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital-Room 13NU
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA CATHERINE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012