Cheung, Angela Man-Wei (CPSO#: 59965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
7 Eaton North - 221
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8049
Fax: (416) 340-4105
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 8-423
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Man-Wei Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Angela M. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung ( CPSO# 59965 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
7 Eaton North-221
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MAN-WEI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990