Cheung, Caroline Marie (CPSO#: 94531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheung ( CPSO# 94531 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013