Cheung, Gordon (CPSO#: 52884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford Advanced Imaging
Suite 100
10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Phone: (905) 568-3768
Fax: (905) 568-9652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cheung ( CPSO# 52884 )

Business Address:
100 - 10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Phone Number: (905) 568-3768

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
Diagnostic Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4372

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989