Cheung, Patrick Charn Fai (CPSO#: 69072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6165
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General - Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 635-2491
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Health -Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Micheal Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-3325
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.C.F. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheung ( CPSO# 69072 )
Dr. L. Yeung ( CPSO# 69247 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 635-2491

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Health Centre Site
12th level
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK CHARN FAI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000