Cheung, Vera King Fung (CPSO#: 88035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsbridge Medical Centre
33 City Center Drive, Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vera King Fung Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Cheung ( CPSO# 88035 )

Business Address:
33 City Centre Drive
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 507-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERA KING FUNG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010