Cheverie, Joslin Nicolle (CPSO#: 86916)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joslin N. Cheverie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheverie ( CPSO# 86916 )

Business Address:
272 Charlotte Street
Suite 301
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 874-5222

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 302 272 Charlotte Street Peterborough ON K9J 2V4
Date Received: 03 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018