Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chevrier, Robert Lionel Arthur (CPSO#: 63606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
879 Shefford Road
Gloucester ON  K1J 8H9
Phone: (613) 741-4342
Fax: (613) 741-0021
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert L. Chevrier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chevrier ( CPSO# 63606 )

Business Address:
879 Shefford Road
Gloucester ON  K1J 8H9
Phone Number: (613) 741-4342

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LIONEL ARTHUR CHEVRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEVRIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992