Chiamvimonvat, Varaporn (CPSO#: 62434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300 3
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 102
Fax: (905) 845-3996
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Chiamvimonvat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chiamvimonvat ( CPSO# 62434 )

Business Address:
300-3 - 690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARAPORN CHIAMVIMONVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIAMVIMONVAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1993