Chiang, Christopher Kuo Chun (CPSO#: 58243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kings Cross Doctor's Office
Unit 4
17 Kings Cross Road
Brampton ON  L6T 3V5
Phone: (905) 799-0925
Fax: (905) 799-4756
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher K. C. Chiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chiang ( CPSO# 58243 )

Business Address:
17 Kingscross Road
Suite 4
Brampton ON  L6T 3V5
Phone Number: (905) 799-0925

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KUO CHUN CHIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988