Chiang, Stephen Chuk-Yim (CPSO#: 56652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Falls Family Health Team
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 258-2818
Fax: (705) 258-2828
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Chiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chiang ( CPSO# 56652 )

Business Address:
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-2818

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHUK-YIM CHIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990