Chiarotto, James Anthony (CPSO#: 59329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4666
Fax: (416) 281-7228
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Chiarotto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chiarotto ( CPSO# 59329 )

Business Address:
105 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ANTHONY CHIAROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIAROTTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1989