Chidambaram, Mala (CPSO#: 73900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peterson ( CPSO# 72684 )
Dr. M. Chidambaram ( CPSO# 73900 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street 8th Floor
Room 8-003h
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (415) 864-3086

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Susan at Tel: (416) 864-3086
Date Received: 13 Sep 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALA CHIDAMBARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIDAMBARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003