Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chin, Joseph Michael (CPSO#: 50014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lawrence-Kingston Road X-Ray &
Ultrasound Inc
Suite 210
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 281-4167
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chin ( CPSO# 50014 )

Business Address:
2B - 4640 Jane Street
North York ON  M3N 2V3
Phone Number: (416) 661-4441

Business Address:
3333 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1V 2J7
Phone Number: (416) 292-3883

Business Address:
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 281-4167

Business Address:
200 - 3447 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1V 3S1
Phone Number: (416) 299-3443

Business Address:
112 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 439-4866

Business Address:
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone Number: (905) 831-2255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHAEL CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1983