Chin, Ki Jinn (CPSO#: 85039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KJ Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chin ( CPSO# 85039 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KI JINN CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008