Ching, Joyce Cheung Yee (CPSO#: 84643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 496-2228
Fax: (416) 496-2229
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
(Centenary site)
7th Floor
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: (416) 281-7102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joyce C.Y. Ching Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ching ( CPSO# 84643 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 496-2228

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
7th West
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 12 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE CHEUNG YEE CHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 12 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2012