Chiodo, Albino (CPSO#: 63953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 510-9962
Fax: (416) 510-9963
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
8 Victoria Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5276
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Chiodo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chiodo ( CPSO# 63953 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 510-9962

Business Address:
Toronto East General
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
8 Victoria Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5276

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Rhode Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBINO CHIODO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIODO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1992