Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chisamore, Brian Carman (CPSO#: 65361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6611
Fax: (416) 530-6482
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
C/O NICU, 1st Flr, OLM Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6067
Fax: 416 530 6505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman ( CPSO# 65524 )
Dr. B. Chisamore ( CPSO# 65361 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CARMAN CHISAMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISAMORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1993