Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chiu, Arthur Kwok-Kwong (CPSO#: 66149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T3
Phone: (416) 269-5808
Fax: (416) 269-5803
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chiu ( CPSO# 66149 )

Business Address:
305 - 2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 269-5808

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 5, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Arthur Kwok-Kwong
            Chiu, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chiu to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ARTHUR KWOK-KWONG CHIU
                                          ("Dr. Chiu")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chiu, certificate of registration number 66149, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214764 (the "Investigation") into my standard of
                  practice.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the                                                                 
                  date on which I sign it.  
            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                        perform Thyroid or  Parathyroid surgery.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), who has signed an undertaking in the form attached
                        at Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to participate in an
                        educational program under the guidance of the Clinical Supervisor
                        as outlined below and as further described in the education plan
                        attached as Appendix "A" to this Undertaking: 
                  
                        Phase 1 - High Level Supervision
                  
                        i)    For a minimum of six weeks, Dr. Chiu will meet with the
                              Clinical Supervisor weekly. 
                  
                        ii)   The Clinical Supervisor will review a minimum of 10 charts a
                              week and will report to the College after four weeks.
                  
                        iii)  During the first month there will be a minimum of 1 full day
                              of observation each week. 
                  
                        Phase 2 - Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                        iv)   After a minimum of six weeks of high level supervision, if
                              the Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves,
                              Dr. Chiu will practise under moderate supervision. 
                  
                        v)    The moderate supervision will last for a minimum of six
                              weeks, during which the Clinical Supervisor and Dr. Chiu will
                              meet every two weeks and will review a minimum of 10 charts
                              every meeting, with a report to the College once a month.  
                  
                        Phase 3 - Low Level Supervision
                  
                        vi)   After a minimum of six weeks of moderate supervision, if the
                              Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves, Dr.
                              Chiu will practise under low level supervision.
                  
                        vii)  The low level supervision will last for a minimum of six
                              months, during which the Clinical Supervisor will meet with
                              Dr. Chiu and review 10 of Dr. Chiu's charts monthly and
                              report to the College once every three months.
                  
                        viii) After a minimum of six months of low-level supervision, if
                              the Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves,
                              Dr. Chiu's Clinical Supervision will terminate. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) Undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s),
                        including reports to the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chiu, shall fully cooperate with the education facilitated
                        by the Clinical Supervisor as set out in this Undertaking and
                        Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by any recommendations of my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not limited to any
                        recommended practice improvements and any recommendations that I
                        participate in further educational opportunities.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chiu, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out under B(6)(d) and/or B(6)(e) above,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Chiu, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of paragraph B(6)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "A"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above
                        and Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chiu, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chiu, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chiu, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chiu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Chiu, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Chiu, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Chiu acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Chiu was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Chiu must not perform thyroid or parathyroid surgery;
                        *     Dr. Chiu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor 
                              acceptable to the College for a minimum of nine months; 
                        *     Dr. Chiu's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Chiu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Chiu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Chiu, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On March 17, 2017, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Kwok-Kwong Chiu, made an order effective April 14, 2017 placing Dr. Chiu on probation for three years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements to successfully complete a clinical training or educational program, practice under an approved practice monitor, not engage in the solo practice of medicine and not supervise physician assistants. This order was made as a result of the action taken against Dr. Chiu by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, which is a cause for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated March 23, 2017.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Arthur Kwok-Kwong Chiu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 5, 2016:

Dr. Chiu was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Chiu must not perform thyroid or parathyroid surgery;
- Dr. Chiu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
acceptable to the College for a minimum of nine months;
- Dr. Chiu's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.