Chiu, Priscilla Pui Lam (CPSO#: 63794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Surgery
Room 1518
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6405
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priscilla Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chiu ( CPSO# 63794 )

Business Address:
Division of Pediatric General and
Thoracic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
1518 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6405

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRISCILLA PUI LAM CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Mar 2002
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1992