Chiu, Simon Sin-Sing (CPSO#: 55764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute/Mental Health Ca
London
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47566
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Psychiatric Clinic
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6G 1G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-6923
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON SIN-SING CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986