Choe, Seong Dong (CPSO#: 60732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Kyunghee University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
2397 Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2X1
Phone: (416) 742-4646
Fax: (416) 742-0138
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seong Dong Choe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choe ( CPSO# 60732 )

Business Address:
4 - 2397 Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2X1
Phone Number: (416) 742-4646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEONG DONG CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990