Choi, Hong-Yung David (CPSO#: 65457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 401
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 273-9793
Fax: (905) 273-7054
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hong-Yung David Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Choi ( CPSO# 65457 )

Business Address:
71 King Street West
Suite 401
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 273-9793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HONG-YUNG DAVID CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993