Choi, Richard Francis Yang Il (CPSO#: 69402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 762-5521
Fax: (416) 762-2154
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6325
Fax: (416) 530-6702
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Choi ( CPSO# 69402 )

Business Address:
2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 411
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 762-5521

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD FRANCIS YANG IL CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2000