Chopra, Nikhil (CPSO#: 68846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
411 - 450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 435-0415
Fax: (519) 435-1862
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chopra ( CPSO# 68846 )

Business Address:
411 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 435-0415

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKHIL CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Feb 2004 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2000