Choudhri, Omer Hafeez (CPSO#: 64271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1992
Fax: (613) 592-0846
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omer Choudhri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Choudhri ( CPSO# 64271 )

Business Address:
Suite 213
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMER HAFEEZ CHOUDHRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUDHRI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1993