Chow, Jennifer Audrey (CPSO#: 81163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3802
Fax: (613) 748-4914
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow ( CPSO# 81163 )

Business Address:
The Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER AUDREY CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009