Chow, Yun Yee (CPSO#: 63914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2880 Ellesmere Road
West Hill ON  M1E 4B8
Phone: (416) 284-1697
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y.Y. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 63914 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 3B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7021

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2480

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Business Address:
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUN YEE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992