Chris, Anthony David (CPSO#: 52840)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Chris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 572 Leighland Drive Waterloo ON N2T 2K2
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017