Christakis, George (CPSO#: 33494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Cardiac and Vascular Surgery
Schulich Heart Centre
Suite H4 06 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6080
Fax: (416) 480-6072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Christakis ( CPSO# 33494 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
H Wing Room 406
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1982