Chu, Marcella Sabrina (CPSO#: 77490)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcella Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Red Lake Medical Associates Box 311 Red Lake ON P0V 2M0
Date Received: 22 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2015