Chu, Patrick Wai Man (CPSO#: 63503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
328 Highway 7 East
Suite 206
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 889-8322
Fax: (905) 889-5017
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
General Division
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6050
Fax: (416) 756-3144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick W. M. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 63503 )

Business Address:
206 - 328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (705) 889-8322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK WAI MAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992