Chuang, Ian (CPSO#: 57437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chuang ( CPSO# 57437 )

Business Address:
MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1987