Chuang, Yi-Ting Evelyn (CPSO#: 88448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evelyn Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chuang ( CPSO# 88448 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
Department of Emergency Medicine
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YI-TING EVELYN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010